EP0403850 - Color encoding photographic film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plummer, William T. 129 Arena Terrace Concord, MA 01742 / US | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Koch, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp Postfach 12 11 20 80035 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Koch, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp, Postfach 12 11 20 D-80035 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90110388.7 | 31.05.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | US19890367965 | 19.06.1989 Original published format: US 367965 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403850 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403850 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/04 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
G03C7/04 (EP,US);
G03B27/735 (EP,US);
H04N1/486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Farbverschlüsselnder photographischer Film | [1990/52] | English: | Color encoding photographic film | [1990/52] | French: | Pellicule photographique codant les couleurs | [1990/52] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/23] | 26.01.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4362806 (WHITMORE KEITH E); | [A]EP0141167 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4610536 (SMYTH WILLIAM K [US], et al); | [A]EP0222316 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [A] - J. STURGE et al.: "IMAGING PROCESSES AND MATERIALS" 8th edition, 1989, pages 209-211, Van Nostrand Reinhold, New York, US |