EP0401770 - Heat-latent, cationic polymerization initiator and resin composition containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD. 1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Oyodokta 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1990/50] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Ohyodo-Kita 2-chome Ohyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Shinji 14-95-401 Makitacho Takatsuki, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Urano, Satoshi 2-6-14 Kasumisaka, Tanabecho Tsuzuki-gun, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90110649.2 | 05.06.1990 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | JP19890142541 | 05.06.1989 Original published format: JP 14254189 | JP19890191659 | 24.07.1989 Original published format: JP 19165989 | JP19890244681 | 19.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24468189 | [1990/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0401770 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0401770 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0401770 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/24, C08K5/19, C08G85/00 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
C07D213/20 (EP);
C07D263/04 (EP);
C08F4/00 (EP);
C08G59/686 (EP);
C08G65/105 (EP);
C08G85/00 (EP,KR);
C08J3/24 (KR);
C08K5/19 (EP,KR);
C08K5/3432 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/50] | Title | German: | Wärmelatenter, kationischer Polymerisationsinitiator und diesen enthaltende Harzzusammensetzungen | [1990/50] | English: | Heat-latent, cationic polymerization initiator and resin composition containing the same | [1990/50] | French: | Initiateur à chaleur latente de polymérisation cationique et compositions résineuses le renfermant | [1990/50] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/13: Teilanmeldung 95100720.2 eingereicht am 05/06/90 | EPB 1995/13: Divisional application 95100720.2 filed on 05/06/90 | EPB 1995/13: Demande divisionnaire 95100720.2 déposée le 05/06/90 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 28.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 15.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95100720.2 / EP0651002 | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0343690 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2507009 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) | [ ] - JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER LETTERS EDITION, vol. 26, no. 11, October 1988, pages 453-457, New York, US; H. UNO et al.: "Quaternary ammonium salts for cationic polymerization initiator" | [ ] - MACROMOLECULES, vol. 22, no. 5, May 1989, pages 2502-2506, Easton, US; H. UNO et al.: "Grafting of a bicyclo ortho ester onto polystyrenes having quaternary ammonium salt moieties" | [ ] - JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER LETTERS EDITION vol. 26, no. 11, October 1988, NEW YORK US pages 453 - 457 | [ ] - MACROMOLECULES. vol. 22, no. 5, May 1989, EASTON US pages 2502 - 2506 |