EP0461281 - Device for detecting air flow through a passageway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1993 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henry, John Christopher 605 Bismark Way King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 02 /
Park, Kyung Tae 710 Newtown Road Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111072.6 | 12.06.1990 | [1991/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461281 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/087, G01F1/20, G01P13/00 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
G01F1/28 (EP);
A61B5/0816 (EP);
A61B5/0876 (EP);
A61M15/009 (EP);
G01P13/0066 (EP);
A61M16/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/51] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erfassen eines Luftstroms in einem Durchgang | [1991/51] | English: | Device for detecting air flow through a passageway | [1991/51] | French: | Dispositif pour détécter un écoulement d'air à travers une canalisation | [1991/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 05.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/25] | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2220485 (PENNWALT PIEZO FILM [GB]); | [Y]DE2849122 (HAUNOLD); | [A]DE3013573 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]EP0314325 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) |