EP0403944 - Securing and adjustment device particularly for ski boots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A. Via Montebelluna 5/7 31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A. Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Bortoli, Giuseppe Via Castellana 195 I-31044 Montebelluna, Treviso / IT | 02 /
Zorzi, Claudio Vicolo Osoppo 7/A I-31057 Silea, Treviso / IT | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90111170.8 | 13.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | IT19890082557 | 22.06.1989 Original published format: IT 8255789 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403944 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403944 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403944 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A43C11/16 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
A43C11/16 (EP,US);
A43C11/165 (EP,US);
Y10S24/909 (US);
Y10T24/2183 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2187 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1990/52] | Title | German: | Halte- und Einstellvorrichtung, insbesondere für Schischuhe | [1990/52] | English: | Securing and adjustment device particularly for ski boots | [1990/52] | French: | Dispositif de maintien et d'ajustement, en particulier pour chaussures de ski | [1990/52] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2341658 (POLYAIR MASCHB GMBH); | [YD]EP0056953 (NORDICA SPA [IT]) | [Y] - RICHTER UND VOSS 'BAUELEMENTE DER FEINMECHANIK' 1959 , VEB VERLAG TECHNIK , BERLIN |