EP0410125 - Piston unit with rolling membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TETRA DEV-CO Via Delfini 1 411 00 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states TETRA DEV-CO Via Delfini 1 I-411 00 Modena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Santi, Franco Via Bazzini 16 I-41100 Modena / IT | 02 /
Bordini, Giorgio Via Luppi 7 I-41030 San Prospero, Modena / IT | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111200.3 | 13.06.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | IT19890021345 | 27.07.1989 Original published format: IT 2134589 | [1991/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410125 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410125 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/00 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
F04B43/009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/05] | Title | German: | Kolbeneinheit mit Rollmembranen | [1991/05] | English: | Piston unit with rolling membrane | [1991/05] | French: | Unité de piston avec des membranes roulantes | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1936811 (HAMBA MASCHF); | [A]DE2553981 (SEIFERT GERD W DIPL ING DR ING) |