EP0402912 - Disk memory system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Takehiko, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Eguchi, Tatsuo, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte TER MEER-MÜLLER-STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111227.6 | 13.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | JP19890151020 | 13.06.1989 Original published format: JP 15102089 | JP19890255480 | 30.09.1989 Original published format: JP 25548089 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0402912 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0402912 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0402912 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/596, G11B20/12 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
G11B5/59655 (EP);
G11B21/10 (KR);
G11B20/1252 (EP);
G11B2020/1282 (EP);
G11B2020/1284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/51] | Title | German: | Plattenspeichersystem | [1990/51] | English: | Disk memory system | [1990/51] | French: | Système de mémoire à disques | [1990/51] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61208675 ; | [A]JP5891512 ; | [A]JP6040570 ; | [Y]US4001883 (STROUT FREDERICK D, et al); | [A]FR2578346 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US4016603 (OTTESEN HJALMAR HOLMBOE) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 40 (P-544)(2487) 5 February 1987, & JP-A-61 208675 (MATSUSHITA) 17 September 1986,, & JP61208675 A 19860917 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 192 (P-218)(1337) 23 August 1983, & JP-A-58 91512 (HITACHI) 31 May 1983,, & JP5891512 A 19830531 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 163 (P-371)(1886) 9 July 1985, & JP-A-60 40570 (HITACHI) 2 March 1985,, & JP6040570 A 19850302 |