EP0404082 - Piezoelectric bending transducer and its usage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoechst CeramTec Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelmstrasse 14 95100 Selb / DE | For all designated states HOERBIGER FLUIDTECHNIK KG Prinz Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states Hoechst CeramTec Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelmstrasse 14 D-95100 Selb / DE | ||
For all designated states HOERBIGER FLUIDTECHNIK KG Prinz Eugen-Strasse 70 A-1040 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uhl, Thomas Hermann-Hesse-Weg 17 D-8672 Selb / DE | 02 /
Frisch, Herbert Reibergasse 9-23/Haus 3 A-1238 Wien / AT | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Peter, et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Hoffmann, Peter, Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1990/52] | Spiess, Bernhard, et al Hoechst AG Zentrale Patentabteilung, Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111599.8 | 20.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | DE19893920368 | 22.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3920368 | DE19893935474 | 25.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3935474 | [1990/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0404082 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0404082 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404082 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/00, F16K31/02, H01L41/08 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
F16K31/006 (EP,US);
H10N30/2042 (EP,US);
H10N30/2047 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/52] | F16K31/00, H01L41/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/52] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Biegewandler und seine Verwendung | [1990/52] | English: | Piezoelectric bending transducer and its usage | [1990/52] | French: | Transducteur de pliage piézoélectrique et son utilisation | [1990/52] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03] | Request for further processing for: | 27.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3152612 (AVERY HOWARD W); | [A]US4237399 (SAKAMOTO HITOSHI); | [A]EP0043456 (FELDMUEHLE AG [DE]); | [A]US4340083 (CUMMINS RICHARD D); | [A]DE3400645 (ENFO GRUNDLAGEN FORSCHUNGS AG [CH]); | [A]US4492360 (LEE II LEIGHTON [US], et al); | [A]US4545561 (BROWN HENRY C [US]); | [AD]DE3608550 (FESTO KG [DE]) |