EP0412268 - Apparatus for interconnecting a control unit having a parallel bus with a channel having a serial link [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casper, Daniel Francis 13 Brett Place Poughkeepsie, New York 12603 / US | 02 /
Flanagan, John Richard RD 1, West Pine Road Staatsburg, New York 12580 / US | 03 /
Miracle, Gerald Holt RD 2, 503 Pine Hill Road Pleasant Valley, New York 12569 / US | 04 /
Neuner, Richard Andrew Lake Shore Villa, Apt. 8C Port Ewen, New York 12466 / US | 05 /
Potvin, Peter Lloyd 2 Russett Lane Ulster Park, New York 12487 / US | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | Rach, Werner, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Rach, Werner, Dr., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/07] | Harrison, Robert John IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/07] | Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111962.8 | 23.06.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | US19890392754 | 11.08.1989 Original published format: US 392754 | [1991/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0412268 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0412268 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412268 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/12 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
G06F13/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verbindung von einer Steuereinheit mit parallelem Bus mit einem Kanal mit serieller Verbindung | [1991/07] | English: | Apparatus for interconnecting a control unit having a parallel bus with a channel having a serial link | [1991/07] | French: | Appareil pour l'interconnexion d'une unité de commande à bus parallèle avec un canal à liaison sérielle | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 11.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.09.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1997/34] | FR | 07.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0191334 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0021489 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |