EP0417413 - Method and machine for making ice-lollies, ice cream on sticks, or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carpigiani S.r.L. 45, Via Emilia I-40011 Anzola Emilia, Bologna / IT | [1991/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manfroni, Ezio 56, Via Altopiano I-40037 Sasso Marconi (BO) / IT | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Attilio, et al Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Porsia, Attilio, Dr., et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 I-16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 90112336.4 | 28.06.1990 | [1991/12] | Priority number, date | IT19890012573 | 14.09.1989 Original published format: IT 1257389 | [1991/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0417413 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0417413 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/26, A23G9/30, A23G9/22, A23G9/08 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
A23G9/30 (EP);
A23G9/08 (EP);
A23G9/083 (EP);
A23G9/221 (EP);
A23G9/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Herstellung von Lutsch-Eis, Stielspeiseeis oder ähnliches | [1991/12] | English: | Method and machine for making ice-lollies, ice cream on sticks, or the like | [1991/12] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication de sucettes congelées, de bâtons de crème glacée et analogues | [1991/12] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE800300 (PILZ ERWIN); | [A]US2637668 (KOSMAS EFTIHIOS); | [Y]GB699404 (ARTHUR ALBERT FRENCH, et al); | [Y]FR1060662 (AEROPIPE & GLASS CO LTD); | [A]US3233562 (SHIZUO NAKAMURA); | [A]FR1539694 (O T E M) |