EP0412280 - Fastening means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOVISION GmbH Entwicklung, Herstellung und Vertrieb von Biomaterialien Am Vogelherd 1 D-98693 Ilmenau / DE | [1993/40] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states GERHARD HUG GMBH Im Kirchenhürstle 4 D-79224 Umkirch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claes, Lutz, Prof. Dr. Sommerweg 5 D-7910 Neu-Ulm/Pfuhl / DE | 02 /
Rehm, Klaus, Prof. Dr. Im Sonnenwinkel 48 D-5030 Hürth-Efferen / DE | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | Rackette, Karl Postfach 1310 79013 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | Rackette, Karl, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.-Ing Postfach 1310 D-79013 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112387.7 | 29.06.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | DE19893926127 | 08.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926127 | [1991/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0412280 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0412280 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412280 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
A61L31/18 (EP);
A61B17/68 (EP);
A61L31/06 (EP);
A61L31/148 (EP);
A61B90/39 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/07] | Title | German: | Befestigungsmittel | [1991/07] | English: | Fastening means | [1991/07] | French: | Moyen de fixation | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 18.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.03.1994 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2357229 (PARTRIDGE ANTHONY [GB]); | [A]EP0146699 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]EP0260222 (ILLI OSCAR EMIL) | Examination | EP0360139 |