EP0410160 - Optical filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HORIBA, LTD. 2 Miyanohigashi-machi Kissyoin Minami-ku Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states HORIBA, LTD. 2 Miyanohigashi-machi Kissyoin Minami-ku Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Masahiko 2-2-65, Kugai Nagaokakyo-City, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Takada, Syuji 100-1, Kego, Iseda-cho Uji-City, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Ohnishi, Toshikazu 495-8, Heso, Ritto-cho Kurita-gun, Shiga-prefecture / JP | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112510.4 | 29.06.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | JP19890087250 | 25.07.1989 Original published format: JP 8725089 | [1991/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0410160 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0410160 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410160 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
G02B5/20 (EP,US);
G01J1/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/05] | Title | German: | Optisches Filter | [1991/05] | English: | Optical filter | [1991/05] | French: | Filtre optique | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60205502 ; | [A]JP63189802 ; | [A]JP63061202 ; | [A]CH583912 (BALZERS PATENT BETEILIG AG); | [A]DE3302565 (KI N PROIZV OB ANALITPRIBOR [SU]); | [A]FR2037986 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS VERWALTUNG) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 64 (P-436)14 March 1986 & JP-A-60 205 502 ( TOPPAN INSATSU ), & JP60205502 A 19860314 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 470 (P-798)9 December 1988 & JP-A-63 189 802 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD ), & JP63189802 A 19881209 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 280 (P-739)2 August 1988 & JP-A-63 061 202 ( NIKON CORP ), & JP63061202 A 19880802 |