EP0406770 - Amorphous alloys superior in mechanical strength, corrosion resistance and formability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 3-8-22, Kamisugi Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | For all designated states TEIKOKU PISTON RING CO. LTD. 9-9, Yaesu 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 3-8-22, Kamisugi Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
For all designated states TEIKOKU PISTON RING CO. LTD. 9-9, Yaesu 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 3-8-22, Kamisugi Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
For all designated states TEIKOKU PISTON RING CO. LTD. 9-9, Yaesu 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 3-8-22, Kamisugi, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Akihisa 11-806, Kawauchijutaku, Mubanchi, Kawauchi Aoba-ku, Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | 03 /
Yamaguchi, Hitoshi 2-11-27, Yamashita-cho Okaya-shi, Nagano / JP | 04 /
Kita, Kazuhiko 1-9-7, Yagiyamaminami, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | 05 /
Takeda, Hideki 2-25-14, Sugekitaura, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/02] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112602.9 | 02.07.1990 | [1991/02] | Priority number, date | JP19890171298 | 04.07.1989 Original published format: JP 17129889 | [1991/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0406770 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0406770 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
C22C45/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/02] | Title | German: | Amorphe Legierungen mit hoher mechanischer Festigkeit, guter Korrosionsbeständigkeit und hohem Formänderungsvermögen | [1991/02] | English: | Amorphous alloys superior in mechanical strength, corrosion resistance and formability | [1991/02] | French: | Alliages amorphes présentant des caractéristiques améliorées de résistance mécanique, de résistance à la corrosion et de plasticité | [1991/02] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0136508 (ALLIED CORP [US]); | [A]DE3524276 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [A]EP0317710 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP], et al) |