EP0406776 - Perfected pipe fitting assembly, particularly for pneumatic systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SISTEM PNEUMATICA S.r.l. Via Persicetana Vecchia, 14 40132 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states SISTEM PNEUMATICA S.r.l. Via Persicetana Vecchia, 14 I-40132 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landi, Enzo Via Kennedy 33 I-40168 San Lazzaro di Savena / IT | 02 /
Gamberini, Giovanni Via Elio Bernardi 7 I-40132 Bologna / IT | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1991/02] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90112613.6 | 02.07.1990 | [1991/02] | Priority number, date | IT19890003546 | 07.07.1989 Original published format: IT 354689 | IT19900003417 | 29.03.1990 Original published format: IT 341790 | [1991/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0406776 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0406776 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0406776 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L39/00, F16L37/12 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
F16L37/084 (EP);
F16L37/008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/02] | F16L39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/02] | Title | German: | Rohrverbindungseinheit, insbesondere für Druckluftsysteme | [1991/02] | English: | Perfected pipe fitting assembly, particularly for pneumatic systems | [1991/02] | French: | Assemblage de raccord de tuyaux, notamment pour systèmes pneumatiques | [1991/02] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 04.01.1995 | SE | 04.04.1995 | [1996/03] |
Former [1995/49] | NL | 04.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7207725U ; | [A]US2516883 (KELLY GEORGE M); | [A]US2772898 (SEELER HENRY W K); | [A]DE1912299 (ICI LTD); | [A]US4068870 (WHITNEY JOHN KIMBALL, et al); | [A]US4123091 (COSENTINO LOUIS C, et al); | [A]DE2856064 (VOSS ARMATUREN) |