EP0413122 - Tying package and its method for producing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorbeer, Peter, Dr. Tulpenweg 10 D-4358 Haltern / DE | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | Becker, Maria Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Becker, Maria, Dipl.-Phys. Postfach 70 01 47 D-70571 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112815.7 | 05.07.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | DE19893926980 | 16.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926980 | [1991/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413122 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413122 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/62 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
B65D5/68 (EP);
B65D85/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/08] | Title | German: | Banderolenpackung und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [1993/06] | English: | Tying package and its method for producing | [1991/08] | French: | Paquet à bandelette et son procédé de fabrication | [1993/06] |
Former [1991/08] | Verpackung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [1991/08] | Emballage à bandelette et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 19.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 15.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3610411 (COLEMAN EUGENE W); | [X]DE2059497 (BRINKMANN AG M) |