EP0411347 - Eeprom memory cell with improved protection against errors due to cell breakdown [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riva, Carlo Via Silvio Pellico 24/b I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia, et al Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | Forattini, Amelia, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90113062.5 | 09.07.1990 | [1991/06] | Priority number, date | IT19890021402 | 01.08.1989 Original published format: IT 2140289 | [1991/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0411347 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0411347 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411347 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/04, G06F11/20 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
G11C29/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/06] | G06F11/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1991/06] | Title | German: | EEPROM-Speicherzelle mit verbessertem Schutz gegen Fehler aufgrund von Zelldurchbruch | [1991/06] | English: | Eeprom memory cell with improved protection against errors due to cell breakdown | [1991/06] | French: | Cellule de mémoire EEPROM à protection d'erreurs dues au claquage de cellule | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.04.1995 | SE | 26.07.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1996/04] | SE | 26.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0268315 (SGS MICROELETTRONICA SPA [IT]); | [Y]EP0293339 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]); | [Y]WO8906429 (ELITE SEMICONDUCTOR & SYSTEMS [US]); | [AP]EP0326465 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) |