EP0407963 - Inside rear view mirror for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURAKAMI KAIMEIDO CO., LTD 12-25, Miyamoto-cho Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka-Ken, 422 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states MURAKAMI KAIMEIDO CO., LTD 12-25, Miyamoto-cho Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka-Ken, 422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugimura, Naomi 3041-7, Mukohjima-cho Shimada-shi, Shizuoka-ken 427 / JP | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton Boehmert & Boehmert Kanzlei Landshut Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton Lederer, Keller & Riederer, Postfach 26 64 D-84010 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113149.0 | 10.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | JP19890082152 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: JP 8215289 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0407963 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0407963 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0407963 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/04 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
B60R1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/03] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeuginnenrückblickspiegel | [1991/03] | English: | Inside rear view mirror for a vehicle | [1991/03] | French: | Rétroviseur intérieur pour véhicule | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59164243 ; | [X]FR1560513 ; | [X]DE944596 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR); | [X]DE3515116 (REITTER & SCHEFENACKER KG [DE]); | [A]FR2001550 (LAVACRISTALLI FOREDIT) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 18 (M-353)(1741) 25 January 1985, & JP-A-59 164243 (TOUKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 17 September 1984,, & JP59164243 A 19840917 |