EP0409054 - Method of electrical distance signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/04] | Method of electrical signal processing | ||
[1992/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 2501 Bienne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 CH-2501 Bienne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delon-Martin, Chantal 7, rue Arago F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Arditi, Marcel Rue Lamartine 10 CH-1203 Genève / CH | 03 /
Farine, Pierre-André Port-Roulant 12A CH-2003 Neuchâtel / CH | 04 /
Meister, Jean-Jacques Chemin de l'Eglise 10 CH-1066 Epalinges / CH | 05 /
Tardy, Yanik Rue du Crêt 4bis CH-1006 Lausanne / CH | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 90113192.0 | 11.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | FR19890009926 | 20.07.1989 Original published format: FR 8909926 | [1991/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409054 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409054 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01B17/02, A61B8/00, G01N29/00 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
A61B8/0858 (EP,US);
G01B17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung eines elektrischen Distanzsignals | [1992/18] | English: | Method of electrical distance signal processing | [1992/18] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'un signal électrique de distance | [1992/18] |
Former [1991/04] | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung eines elektrischen Signals | ||
Former [1991/04] | Method of electrical signal processing | ||
Former [1991/04] | Procédé de traitement d'un signal électrique | Examination procedure | 20.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.04.1992 | ES | 29.04.1992 | IT | 29.04.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | DK | 29.04.1992 | |
IT | 29.04.1992 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 29.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2308909 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]US4063549 (BERETSKY IRWIN, et al); | [A]EP0150997 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |