EP0409067 - Hydratable bioelectrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IOMED, INC. 1290 West 2320 South, A Salt Lake City Utah 84119-1449 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states IOMED, INC. 1290 West 2320 South, #A Salt Lake City, Utah 84119-1449 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petelenz, Tomasz J. 2520 Blaine Avenue Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | 02 /
Jacobsen, Stephen C. 274 South 1200 East Salt Lake City, Utah 84102 / US | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113284.5 | 11.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | US19890383939 | 21.07.1989 Original published format: US 383939 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0409067 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0409067 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/30, A61N1/04 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
A61N1/0436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | Durch Hydrieren aktivierbare Bio-Elektrode | [1991/04] | English: | Hydratable bioelectrode | [1991/04] | French: | Electrode biologique hydratable | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/50] | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0060451 [ ] (MEDTRONIC INC [US]); | US4383529 [ ] (WEBSTER HENRY L); | EP0242275 [ ] (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | US4731049 [ ] (PARSI EDGARDO J [US]); | EP0269246 [ ] (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | WO8803821 [ ] (UNIV BOSTON [US]); | EP0302536 [ ] (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | EP0309309 [ ] (OREAL [FR]) |