EP0415045 - Device for removing fuel and fuel vapours [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERBURG GMBH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states PIERBURG GMBH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 D-41460 Neuss / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Hans Jürgen Georgstrasse 12 D-4650 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [1991/10] | Application number, filing date | 90113357.9 | 12.07.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | DE19890009976U | 19.08.1989 Original published format: DE 8909976 U | [1991/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415045 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415045 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415045 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/08 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
B60K15/03504 (EP);
F02M25/0872 (EP);
F02M35/10222 (EP);
F02M2025/0845 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Brennstoff und Brennstoffdämpfen | [1991/10] | English: | Device for removing fuel and fuel vapours | [1991/10] | French: | Dispositif pour éloigner le combustible et les vapeurs de combustible | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 15.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.09.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4168686 (WAKITA NOBUAKI, et al); | [Y]DE3623894 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [AP]US4926825 (OHTAKA SHOICHI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3832500 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) |