EP0409086 - One-step liquid phase process for dimethyl ether synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1991/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsiung, Thomas Hsiao-Ling 4727 Glenwood Circle Emmaus, PA 18049 / US | 02 /
White, James Ferguson 4970 Briarwood Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | 03 /
Lewnard, John Joseph R.D. No.41 Emmaus, PA 18049 / US | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113362.9 | 12.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | US19890381450 | 18.07.1989 Original published format: US 381450 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409086 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/04, C07C41/01 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
C07C41/01 (EP);
C07C41/09 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/01, C07C43/043 (EP);
C07C41/09, C07C43/043 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/04] | Title | German: | Einstufiges Flüssigphasen-Verfahren zur Synthese von Dimethylether | [1991/04] | English: | One-step liquid phase process for dimethyl ether synthesis | [1991/04] | French: | Procédé à phase liquide en une seule opération pour la synthèse de l'éther diméthylique | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 12.03.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0324475 ; | [AD]US4590176 ; | [AD]US4521540 ; | [A]DE3220547 ; | [A]GB2097382 ; | [A]GB278353 ; | [AP]EP0343454 |