EP0409167 - High purity silica and method for producing high purity silica [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mochizuki, Tadashi, c/o Patent & License Dept. NKK Keihin Bldg, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 02 /
Iwata, Hideo, c/o Patent & License Dept. NKK Keihin Bldg, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113683.8 | 17.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | JP19890185764 | 18.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18576489 | JP19890297145 | 15.11.1989 Original published format: JP 29714589 | JP19890302415 | 21.11.1989 Original published format: JP 30241589 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0409167 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0409167 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/193 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
C01B33/193 (EP);
C01P2006/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | Kieselsäure hoher Reinheit sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1991/04] | English: | High purity silica and method for producing high purity silica | [1991/04] | French: | Silice de haute pureté et son procédé de préparation | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 22.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/32] | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60191016 ; | [A]JP62056319 ; | [XP]GB2222823 ; | [A]EP0143848 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (LATESTS), week 45, accession no. 85-280464, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-60 191 016 (NIPPON CHEM. IND. K.K.) 28-09-1985, & JP60191016 A 00000000 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (LATEST), week 16, accession no. 87-111615, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-62 056 319 (NIPPON CHEM. IND. K.K.) 12-03-1987, & JP62056319 A 00000000 |