EP0413963 - Radio communication apparatus for rapidly knowing whether the apparatus is within or out of a service area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudoh, Kazuhiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113761.2 | 18.07.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | JP19890184915 | 18.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18491589 | [1991/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0413963 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0413963 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413963 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/18, H04M1/72, G08B3/10 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
G08B3/1016 (EP,US);
G08B3/1066 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M1/72516 (EP,US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04W88/022 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/09] | H04Q7/02, H04M1/72, G08B3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1991/09] | Title | German: | Funkkommunikationsgerät, um schnell festzustellen ob sich das Gerät inner- oder ausserhalb eines Dienstbereiches befindet | [1991/09] | English: | Radio communication apparatus for rapidly knowing whether the apparatus is within or out of a service area | [1991/09] | French: | Appareil de radio communication pour déterminer rapidement si l'appareil est dans ou en dehors d'une zone de service | [1991/09] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61120536 ; | [X]JP59149435 ; | [XP]EP0330514 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 306 (E-446)(2362) 17 October 1986 & JP-A-61 120 536 ( NEC CORPORATION ), & JP61120536 A 19861017 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 281 (E-286)(1718) 21 December 1984 & JP-A-59 149 435 ( NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA ), & JP59149435 A 19841221 |