EP0409201 - Thermal transfer recording method and recording apparatus utilizing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Takeshi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Wada, Satoshi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Makoto c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Takehiro c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Takeda, Tomoyuki c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Ishida, Yasushi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Yokoyama, Minoru c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Tomoda, Akihiro c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Yamada, Masakatsu c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 10 /
Awai, Takashi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/04] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113773.7 | 18.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | JP19890184413 | 19.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18441389 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0409201 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0409201 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409201 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/38 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
B41J2/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/04] | Title | German: | Mit Wärmeübertragung arbeitendes Aufzeichnungsgerät und Verfahren | [1991/04] | English: | Thermal transfer recording method and recording apparatus utilizing the same | [1991/04] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'enregistrement par transfert thermique | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 04.05.1994 | [1995/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62003969 ; | [A]EP0295953 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4745415 (KONDA SHOJI [JP], et al); | [A]US4558963 (APPLEGATE STEVEN L [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 172 (M-595)(2619) 03 June 1987, & JP-A-62 003969 (RYOHEI OWADA) 09 January 1987,, & JP62003969 A 19870109 |