EP0409242 - Monoclonal antibody against human CD4 peptide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.03.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Calpis Food Industry Co., Ltd. 20-3, 2-chome Ebisu-Nishi Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states The Calpis Food Industry Co., Ltd. 20-3, 2-chome Ebisu-Nishi Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikuta, Kazuyoshi 2-3, Nishi 9-chome, Minami 16-jo, Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | 02 /
Ohki, Kohji Ra Bahn No. 101, 9-chome, Shinkawa 4-jo Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | 03 /
Ohmura, Kazutaka 3-3-14, Kitakashiwa Kashiwa-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Kato, Shiro 4-23-7 Fujishirodai Suita-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Bockhorni, Josef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/04] | Bockhorni, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113869.3 | 19.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | JP19890187478 | 21.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18747889 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409242 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/08, // A61K39/395 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07K14/70514 (EP);
C07K16/2812 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2317/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/04] | Title | German: | Monoklonaler Antikörper gegen ein Peptid des menschlichen CD4 | [1991/04] | English: | Monoclonal antibody against human CD4 peptide | [1991/04] | French: | Anticorps monoclonal contre un peptide du CD4 humain | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.11.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/19] | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/19] | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8801304 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) | [X] - ARCH. VIROL. vol. 105, no. 1-2, 1989, Vienna, Austria pages 129 - 135; Y. HAYASHI et al.: "Inhibition of HIV-1 replication and syncytium formation by synthetic CD4 peptides" | [A] - SCIENCE vol. 241, 05 August 1988, Washington DC, USA pages 712 - 716; J. LIFSON et al.: "Synthetic CD4 peptide derivatives that inhibit HIV infection and cytopathicity" |