EP0409281 - (R-(R*R*))-2-(4-fluorophenyl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methylethyl-3-phenyl-4((phenylamino)-carbonyl)-1H-pyrrole-1-heptanoic acid, its lactone form and salts thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/04] | (R-(R*R*))-2-(4-fluorophenyl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methylethyl-3-phenyl-4((phenylamino)-carbonyl)-1h-pyrolle-1-heptanoic acid, its lactone form and salts thereof | ||
[2001/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Bruce David 6089 White Swan Lane Ann Arbor, Michigan 48108 / US | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/04] | Mansmann, Ivo Gödecke AG Patentwesen Mooswaldallee 1-9 D-79090 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90113986.5 | 20.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | US19890384187 | 21.07.1989 Original published format: US 384187 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409281 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409281 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/327, C07D405/00, A61K31/40 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D207/327 (KR);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D207/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | [R-(R*R*)]-2-(4-Fluorophenyl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methylethyl-3-phenyl-4-[(phenylamino)-carbonyl]-1H-pyrrol-1-heptansäure, ihre Lactonform und Salze davon | [1991/04] | English: | (R-(R*R*))-2-(4-fluorophenyl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methylethyl-3-phenyl-4((phenylamino)-carbonyl)-1H-pyrrole-1-heptanoic acid, its lactone form and salts thereof | [2001/44] | French: | Acide [(R-(R'R')]-2-(4-fluorophényl)-bêta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-méthyléthyl)-3-phényl-4-[(phénylamino)-carbonyl]-1H-pyrrole-1-heptanoique, sa forme lactonique et ses sels | [1991/04] |
Former [1991/04] | (R-(R*R*))-2-(4-fluorophenyl)-beta,delta-dihydroxy-5-(1-methylethyl-3-phenyl-4((phenylamino)-carbonyl)-1h-pyrolle-1-heptanoic acid, its lactone form and salts thereof | Examination procedure | 20.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 05.09.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Appeal following examination | 29.10.1996 | Appeal received No. T0229/97 | 09.01.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.10.2000 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 31.10.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.07.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP00115656.1 / EP1061073 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4681893 (ROTH BRUCE D [US]) | [ ] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 28, 1985 G.E. STOKKER et al. "3- -Hydroxy-3-methylglutaryl- -coencyme A reductase inhibitors. 1. Structural modifica - tion of 5-substituted 3,5- -dihydroxypentanoic acids and their lactone derivatives" pages 347-358 | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 28, no. 8, 1987 J.E. LYNCH et al. "Synthesis of an HMG-COA reductase inhibitor; a diastereo- selective aldol approach" pages 1385-1388 |