EP0410365 - Process for the preparation of self-curing cationic binders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Bundesstrasse 175 A-8402 Werndorf / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states Vianova Kunstharz Aktiengesellschaft Bundesstrasse 175 A-8402 Werndorf / AT | ||
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states Vianova Kunstharz Aktiengesellschaft A-8402 Werndorf / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paar, Willibald, Dr. Schanzelgasse 19 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Pampouchidis, George, Dr. Obere Teichstrasse 31 A-8010 Graz / AT | [1991/05] | Application number, filing date | 90114133.3 | 24.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | AT19890001819 | 28.07.1989 Original published format: AT 181989 | [1991/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0410365 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0410365 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410365 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/44, C08G18/58, C08L63/00, C08L61/34 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
C09D5/4419 (EP);
C09D163/10 (KR);
C08G18/544 (EP);
C08L63/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L75/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von selbstvernetzenden kationischen Lackbindemitteln | [1991/05] | English: | Process for the preparation of self-curing cationic binders | [1991/05] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de liants cationiques auto-durcissants | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.03.1994 | GB | 23.03.1994 | NL | 23.03.1994 | SE | 23.03.1994 | [2002/23] |
Former [1995/12] | BE | 23.03.1994 | |
GB | 23.03.1994 | ||
NL | 23.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | BE | 23.03.1994 | |
GB | 23.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | GB | 23.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0209857 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]); | [A]EP0304854 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]); | [A]DE3306111 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]) |