EP0468070 - A method for preparing spherular silica gel particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI SILYSIA CHEMICAL LTD. 1846, 2-chome, Kozoji-cho Kasugai-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states FUJI SILYSIA CHEMICAL LTD. 1846, 2-chome, Kozoji-cho Kasugai-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states FUJI-DAVISON CHEMICAL LTD. 1846, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kano, Jiro 1846, Kozoji 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Orii, Ryuji 1846, Kozoji 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Horinouchi, Yuzo 1846, Kozoji 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Ito, Mutsuhiro 1846 Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Hans, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Otto Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans Vetter, Dipl.-Ing. Martin Abel, H lderlinweg 58 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90114201.8 | 25.07.1990 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468070 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468070 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/154 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
C01B33/16 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
B01J37/0045 (EP,US);
C01B33/154 (EP,US);
C01B33/157 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von kugelförmigen Silikagelteilchen | [1992/05] | English: | A method for preparing spherular silica gel particles | [1992/05] | French: | Méthode de préparation de particules de gel de silice spheriques | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP62275014 ; | [A]JP62143817 ; | [A]JP5365293 ; | [A]US3501269 (WINYALL MILTON E, et al); | [A]US4127641 (ALDCROFT DEREK, et al); | [A]GB1094798 (GRACE W R & CO); | [A]DE1667078 (GRACE W R & CO) | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 165 (C-496)(3012), 18 May 1988; & JP - A - 62275014 (TOYO SODA MFG CO. LTD.) 30.11.1987, & JP62275014 A 19880518 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 371 (C-462)(2818), 3 December 1987; & JP - A - 62143817 (TOYO SODA MFG CO. LTD.) 27.06.1987, & JP62143817 A 19871203 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2, no. 100 (C-78), 18 August 1978; & JP - A - 5365293 (CENTRAL GLASS K.K.) 06.10.1978, & JP5365293 A 19780818 |