EP0412356 - Chain for a tenter frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brückner Trockentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Benzstrasse 8-10 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states Brückner Trockentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Benzstrasse 8-10 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gresens, Harry Max-Eyth-Strasse 33 D-7141 Benningen/Neckar / DE | 02 /
Tiefenbach, Johann Weidenstrasse 27 D-7441 Neckartailfingen / DE | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90114225.7 | 25.07.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | DE19893926508 | 10.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926508 | [1991/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412356 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412356 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0412356 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D06C3/02 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
D06C3/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/07] | Title | German: | Warenbahn-Transportkette für Spannmaschinen | [1991/07] | English: | Chain for a tenter frame | [1991/07] | French: | Chaîne de rame | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.1994
30.11.1994
ADMISSIBLE Stentex GmbH Tschaikowskistrasse 37 D-07548 Gera (Thüringen) / DE Opponent's representative Wenger, René, et al, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | 02
08.03.1995
22.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE A. Monforts Textilmaschinen GmbH & Co Schwalmstrasse 301 D-41238 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative von Creytz, Dietrich Tannenweg 25 41844 Wegberg / DE | 03
09.03.1995
22.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Babcock Textilmaschinen GmbH Hittfelder Kirchweg 21 D-21220 Seevetal / DE Opponent's representative Planker, Karl-Josef c/o Babcock-BSH GmbH, Parkstrasse 10 47829 Krefeld / DE | 04
15.03.1995
12.06.1995
ADMISSIBLE Lindauer Dornier Gesellschaft mbH Rickenbacher Strasse 119 D-88129 Lindau/Bodensee / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.1994
30.11.1994
ADMISSIBLE Stentex GmbH Tschaikowskistrasse 37 D-07548 Gera (Thüringen) / DE Opponent's representative Wenger, René, et al, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Marktgasse 18 CH-9500 Wil / CH | ||
02
08.03.1995
22.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE A. Monforts Textilmaschinen GmbH & Co Schwalmstrasse 301 D-41238 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative von Creytz, Dietrich, Dipl.-Phys. Tannenweg 25 D-41844 Wegberg / DE | |||
03
09.03.1995
22.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Babcock Textilmaschinen GmbH Hittfelder Kirchweg 21 D-21220 Seevetal / DE Opponent's representative Planker, Karl Josef, Dipl.-Phys. c/o Babcock-BSH AG Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | |||
04
15.03.1995
12.06.1995
ADMISSIBLE Lindauer Dornier Gesellschaft mbH Rickenbacher Strasse 119 D-88129 Lindau/Bodensee / DE | |||
Former [1995/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.1994
30.11.1994
ADMISSIBLE Stentex GmbH Tschaikowskistrasse 37 D-07548 Gera (Thüringen) / DE Opponent's representative Wenger, René, et al, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Marktgasse 18 CH-9500 Wil / CH | 24.03.1995 | No. 04: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 07.06.1995 | No. 04: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 16.06.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.06.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.06.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.06.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.06.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.12.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1555998 ; | [AD]DE3333938 (BRUECKNER TROCKENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2621334 (THERMANORD SA GROUPE [FR]) |