EP0468076 - Apparatus for expanding tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kastl, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Widerlichstrasse 13 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Mechtold, Helmut, Ing. grad. Kesselgraben 2 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1992/05] | Application number, filing date | 90114371.9 | 26.07.1990 | [1992/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468076 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/20 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B21D39/203 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufweiten eines Rohres | [1992/05] | English: | Apparatus for expanding tubes | [1992/05] | French: | Dispositif d'élargissement de tubes | [1992/05] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 29.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/25] | 08.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time [1992/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.10.1991 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0041835 ; | [X]EP0177045 ; | [X]CA1152876 ; | [X]BE902924 ; | [A]FR1365999 ; | [A]FR1330224 ; | [A]FR1527073 ; | [A]DE3720485 |