EP0410470 - Dyeing composition for keratin fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 1-14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 1-14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muraoka, Tsutomu 4-12-201, Tachibana 5-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90114456.8 | 27.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | JP19890194473 | 27.07.1989 Original published format: JP 19447389 | [1991/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0410470 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0410470 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410470 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0410470 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/411 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1991/05] | Title | German: | Färbemittel für keratinische Fasern | [1991/05] | English: | Dyeing composition for keratin fibers | [1991/05] | French: | Composition tinctoriale pour fibres kératiniques | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 08.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.1994
11.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Wella AG Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | 02
22.12.1994
05.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TTP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.1994
11.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Wella AG Berliner Allee 65 D-64295 Darmstadt / DE | ||
02
22.12.1994
05.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TTP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 26.01.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.05.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.01.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.04.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.10.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5359041 ; | [A]FR1338063 (INTERPAL S A); | [A]FR2508055 (OREAL [FR]); | [AP]EP0352375 (CHANG TEH SHAN) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 93 (C-78), 29th July 1978; & JP-A-53 59 041 (KANEBO K.K.) 27-05-1978, & JP5359041 A 00000000 |