EP0412426 - Self-oscillating burst mode transmitter with integral number of periods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For:SE
Siemens-Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna 1 / SE | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silvian, Sergiu 5656 Pine Cone Road La Crescenta, California 91214 / US | [1991/07] | Application number, filing date | 90114784.3 | 01.08.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | US19890391077 | 08.08.1989 Original published format: US 391077 | [1991/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0412426 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0412426 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412426 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03B11/04, H03L7/24 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
H03B5/1221 (EP,US);
H03B5/1228 (EP,US);
H03B11/10 (EP,US);
H04B2001/0491 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/07] | Title | German: | Selbsttätig in Burst-Mode oszillierender Sender mit einer ganzen Periodenzahl | [1991/07] | English: | Self-oscillating burst mode transmitter with integral number of periods | [1991/07] | French: | Emetteur auto-oscillant en mode burst avec un nombre entier de périodes | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 04.08.1993 | [1994/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2526611 (TELECTRONICS PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]US4571589 (SLOCUM CHESTER D [US], et al); | [A]WO8903617 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 295, November 1988, pages 883-884, New York, US; G.A. HOFFMAN: "Triggered LC oscillator with frequency stability" |