EP0412473 - Method for regulating the internal temperature of a cold load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böckmann, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing. Kostheimer Landstrasse 17 D-6502 Mainz-Kostheim / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Panoramastrasse 49 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115028.4 | 04.08.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | DE19893926192 | 08.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926192 | [1991/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0412473 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0412473 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/04, G05D23/20, // F25B5/02 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
F25B5/02 (EP,US);
F25B41/22 (EP,US);
F25B41/24 (EP,US);
F25B2400/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung der Innenraumtemperatur eines Kälteverbrauchers | [1991/07] | English: | Method for regulating the internal temperature of a cold load | [1991/07] | French: | Procédé de régulation de la température interne d'une charge frigorifique | [1991/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 14.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/38] | 06.05.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0295377 (HERMLE BERTHOLD GMBH MASCHF [DE]); | [Y]US4771610 (NAKASHIMA YASUO [JP], et al); | [A]US4084388 (NELSON LORNE W); | [A]US4510767 (KOMATSU FUMIAKI [JP], et al) |