EP0470283 - Method and circuit arrangement for determining the quality of virtual circuits going through an ATM switching arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schefts, Horst, Dipl.-Phys. Adelheidstrasse 14 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1992/07] | Application number, filing date | 90115250.4 | 08.08.1990 | [1992/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470283 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470283 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/26, H04L12/14 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
H04L49/254 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L49/205 (EP,US);
H04L49/3081 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5625 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5636 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5639 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5647 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zum Ermitteln der Güte von über eine ATM-Vermittlungseinrichtung verlaufenden virtuellen Verbindungen | [1992/07] | English: | Method and circuit arrangement for determining the quality of virtual circuits going through an ATM switching arrangement | [1992/07] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour déterminer la qualité de circuits virtuels transitant par un dispositif de commutation ATM | [1992/07] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0310173 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM 1990 Mai 1990, Stockholm(SE) Seiten 21 - 26; T.KOINUMA et al.: "AN ATM SWITCHING SYSTEM BASED ON A DISTRIBUTED CONTROL ARCHITECTURE" |