EP0416310 - Liftable turn axle unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirschmann, Rudolf Fastlinger Ring 7 D-8044 Unterschleissheim / DE | 02 /
Stummer, Josef Glockenbecherstrasse 16a D-8000 München 45 / DE | [1991/11] | Application number, filing date | 90115271.0 | 09.08.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | DE19893929788 | 07.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3929788 | [1991/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416310 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416310 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62D61/12 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
B60G11/107 (EP);
B60G17/019 (EP);
B60G5/053 (EP);
B62D61/125 (EP);
B60G2200/318 (EP);
B60G2202/112 (EP);
B60G2202/143 (EP);
B60G2204/121 (EP);
B60G2204/125 (EP);
B60G2204/4232 (EP);
B60G2204/4504 (EP);
B60G2300/0262 (EP);
B60G2300/402 (EP);
B60G2400/61 (EP);
B60G2800/019 (EP);
B60G2800/915 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1991/11] | Title | German: | Anhebbares Doppelachsaggregat | [1991/11] | English: | Liftable turn axle unit | [1991/11] | French: | Unité d'essieu tandem levable | [1991/11] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2740264 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [X]GB2164007 (CASTLE TRAILERS LIMITED); | [X]BE548526 ; | [X]DE1297491 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) | Examination | DE3428867 | DE1555685 |