EP0470289 - Arrangement for executing maintenance and mounting tasks in crane arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABUS Kransysteme GmbH & Co. KG. Sonnenweg 1 51647 Gummersbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states ABUS Kransysteme GmbH & Co. KG. Sonnenweg 1 D-51647 Gummersbach / DE | ||
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states ABUS Kransysteme GmbH & Co. KG. Sonnenweg 1 D-51647 Gummersbach / DE | ||
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states ABUS WERNER BÜHNE KG. Sonnenweg 1 D-51647 Gummersbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bube, Eckhard, Dipl.-Ing. Immertweg 10 D-5270 Gummersbach / DE | 02 /
Bühne, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Talsperrenweg 1 D-5270-Gummersbach / DE | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Dörner, Lothar Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Dörner, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing. Stresemannstrasse 15 D-58095 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115368.4 | 10.08.1990 | [1992/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470289 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B66C15/00, G07C3/00 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
B66C15/00 (EP);
G07C3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1992/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Durchführung von Wartungs- und Montagearbeiten an einer Krananlage | [1992/07] | English: | Arrangement for executing maintenance and mounting tasks in crane arrangement | [1992/07] | French: | Installation pour exécuter des travaux d'entretien et de montage à une installation de grue | [1992/07] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0364994 ; | [Y]GB2216290 ; | [Y]US4119943 ; | [A]EP0353099 ; | [A]DE3420596 ; | [A]GB2187432 | [Y] - BETRIEBSTECHNIK, Heft 1, Band 17, Nr. 1, Januar 1976, Seiten 17-20; S. ZIMMERMANN: "Prüfung von Hebezeugen" |