EP0421090 - Radiator attachment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Attinger, Thomas Reutlinger Strasse 131 D-7000 Stuttgart 70 / DE | 02 /
Plonus, Frank Fuchswaldstrasse 74 D-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | [1991/15] | Application number, filing date | 90115437.7 | 11.08.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | DE19893933410 | 06.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3933410 | [1991/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421090 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421090 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/04 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
B60K11/04 (EP,US);
F28F2275/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/15] | Title | German: | Halterung für einen Kühler | [1991/15] | English: | Radiator attachment | [1991/15] | French: | Fixation d'un radiateur | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3246583 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]DE8634544U ; | [AD]DE2634990 (AUDI AG) |