EP0419822 - Controller for edgelike connecting of an outgoing fabric web of a supply reel with the beginning of a new reel of fabric web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erhardt & Leimer KG Leitershoferstrasse 80 D-86157 Augsburg / DE | [1991/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mack, Horst Arnulfstr. 17 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Steinhardt, Alois Rissweg 4 D-8903 Bobingen / DE | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Fay, Hermann, et al PAe Fay Dziewior & Hentrich Postfach 17 67 89007 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Fay, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Dipl.-Phys. Hermann Fay und Dr. Joachim Dziewior Postfach 17 67 D-89007 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115471.6 | 11.08.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | DE19893931852 | 23.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3931852 | [1991/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419822 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419822 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/00 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
B65H19/105 (EP,US);
B65H19/2215 (EP,US);
B65H2408/23152 (EP,US);
B65H2553/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/14] | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtung zum kantengleichen Verbinden der auslaufenden Warenbahn einer sich abwikkelnden Warenbahnrolle mit dem Bahnanfang einer neuen Warenbahnrolle | [1991/14] | English: | Controller for edgelike connecting of an outgoing fabric web of a supply reel with the beginning of a new reel of fabric web | [1991/14] | French: | Organe de commande pour connecter lisière à lisière une nappe de tissu sortant du rouleau dévidant avec le commencement du rouleau nouveau d'une nappe de tissu | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 18.06.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4848691 (MUTO YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]FR2621901 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0251102 (AZIONARIA COSTRUZIONI ACMA SPA [IT]) | [AD] - VDI-NACHRICHTEN, Jahrgang 16, Heft Nr. 182. Mai 1962 |