EP0421098 - Shutter assembly for a heat exchanger of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mercedesstrasse 136 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bandlow, Reiner Steinbruchstrasse 64 D-7316 Köngen / DE | 02 /
Kleineberg, Wolfgang Friedensstrasse 31 D-7260 Calw 4 / DE | [1991/15] | Application number, filing date | 90115639.8 | 16.08.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | DE19893933199 | 05.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3933199 | [1991/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421098 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421098 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/04, F24F13/15 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
F01P7/10 (EP,US);
B60K11/085 (EP,US);
B60K11/04 (EP);
Y02T10/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/15] | Title | German: | Abdeckvorrichtung für einen Wärmetauscher eines Fahrzeugs | [1991/15] | English: | Shutter assembly for a heat exchanger of a vehicle | [1991/15] | French: | Dispositif d'obturation pour un échangeur thermique de véhicule | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4735131 (MATSUNO YOSHIO [JP]); | [APD]DE3836374 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) |