EP0471110 - System and method for providing enlarged print of color transparencies and negatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kobel, John O. 254, Queen Street Montreal Quebec H3C 2N8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states Kobel, John O. 254, Queen Street Montreal, Quebec H3C 2N8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [1992/08] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 24 48 D-58414 Witten / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115780.0 | 17.08.1990 | [1992/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471110 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46, G03C7/00 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
H04N1/6027 (EP);
G03C7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen von vergrösserten Farbdrucken von Transparenten und Negativen | [1992/08] | English: | System and method for providing enlarged print of color transparencies and negatives | [1992/08] | French: | Système et procédé pour l'obtention d'impressions élargies de diapositives et de négatives en couleur | [1992/08] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/05] | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2148658 ; | [YD]US4325631 ; | [A]WO8606907 ; | [AD]DE1948854 ; | [A]US4866513 | [A] - SMPTE JOURNAL, vol. 99, no. 3, March 1990, pages 191-199, White Plains, NY, US; L.-E. KJELLSTRÖM: "Control and prediction of film density and color balance in the developing process" |