EP0431260 - Flexible cable connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | Correction of patent application | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Squires, John Jay R.D. No. 1 Box 176A, Endicott New York 13760 / US | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/24] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90115889.9 | 20.08.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | US19890446574 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: US 446574 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0431260 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431260 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0431260 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/66, H01R9/09 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
H01R12/78 (EP,US);
H01R12/88 (EP,US);
H05K3/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/24] | Title | German: | Flachkabelstecker | [1991/24] | English: | Flexible cable connector | [1991/24] | French: | Connecteur pour câbles plats | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4602317 (ROVNYAK RICHARD M [US], et al); | [A]US4787854 (LE PARQUIER GUY [FR]); | [A]US4647125 (LANDI VINCENT R [US], et al); | [A]EP0106137 (ADVANCED CIRCUIT TECH [US]) |