EP0416361 - N-(5-alkyl thiophenyl)-nitrogenheterocycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.02.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooms, Pieter, Dr. Doerperhofstrasse 16 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Lürssen, Klaus, Dr. August-Kierspel-Strasse 145 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 03 /
Santel, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Grünstrasse 9a D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 04 /
Schmidt, Robert R., Dr. Im Waldwinkel 110 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 05 /
Krauskopf, Birgit, Dr. Kicke 19 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 1 / DE | [1991/11] | Application number, filing date | 90115966.5 | 21.08.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | DE19893929170 | 02.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3929170 | [1991/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416361 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/452, C07D207/02, C07D233/96, C07D263/44, A01N43/36, A01N43/76, A01N43/50 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
C07D207/452 (EP);
A01N37/32 (EP);
A01N39/00 (EP);
A01N43/50 (EP);
A01N43/76 (EP);
C07D233/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/11] | Title | German: | N-(5-Alkylthiophenyl)-Stickstoffheterocyclen | [1991/11] | English: | N-(5-alkyl thiophenyl)-nitrogenheterocycles | [1991/11] | French: | N-(5-alkythiophényl)hétérocycles azotés | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/14] | 20.11.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0190755 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]US4582903 (MIRVISS STANLEY B [US]); | [A]US3853912 (BUBLITZ D); | [A]EP0288789 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]DE3642372 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]EP0049841 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP0262428 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al); | [A]EP0241559 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al) |