EP0414213 - Hydraulic power steering apparatus for industrial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Tsukasa, c/o K.K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisa 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Ohta, Shuji, c/o K.K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi / JP | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/09] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116015.0 | 21.08.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | JP19890215407 | 22.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21540789 | [1991/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0414213 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0414213 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414213 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/08, B62D5/12 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
B62D5/09 (EP,US);
B62D5/06 (KR);
B62D5/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/09] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Servolenkung für ein Nutzfahrzeug | [1991/09] | English: | Hydraulic power steering apparatus for industrial vehicle | [1991/09] | French: | Direction assistée hydraulique pour véhicule industriel | [1991/09] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59167371 ; | [A]JP57095256 ; | [A]GB2173458 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [AP]WO8809280 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2896734 (MICHAEL TOTH); | [A]FR2510506 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 022 (M-354)30 January 1985 & JP-A-59 167 371 ( NIPPON SEIKO ) 20 September 1984, & JP59167371 A 19840920 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 187 (M-158)25 September 1982 & JP-A-57 095 256 ( KAYABA IND CO ) 14 June 1982, & JP57095256 A 19820614 | Examination | JPS61261164 |