EP0415243 - Platinum catalyzed heterocyclic compound compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riding, Karen Dorothy 21 Bellwood Way Castleton, New York 12033 / US | 02 /
Crivello, James Vincent 756 Carlton Road Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 03 /
Lee, Julia Lam 2456 River Road Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/37] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/31] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1991/10] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116024.2 | 22.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | US19890403214 | 01.09.1989 Original published format: US 403214 | US19900473802 | 02.02.1990 Original published format: US 473802 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415243 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415243 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/06, C08L83/04, C08L33/14, C08G59/40, C08G59/18, C08K5/54 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
C08K5/5419 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (KR);
C08G59/68 (EP,US);
C08G65/16 (EP,US);
C08K5/549 (EP,US);
C08L83/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/5419, C08L83/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/549, C08L83/06 (US,EP);
C08L83/06, C08L83/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | Mit Platin katalysierte Massen auf Basis heterocyclischer Verbindungen | [1991/10] | English: | Platinum catalyzed heterocyclic compound compositions | [1991/10] | French: | Compositions de composés hétérocycliques à catalyseur platine | [1991/12] |
Former [1991/10] | Composition de composés hétérocycliques à catalyseur platine | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/01] | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4288345 (ASHBY BRUCE A, et al); | [A]US4547431 (ECKBERG RICHARD P [US]); | [A]EP0189653 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0204171 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]FR2622201 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) |