EP0416396 - Tetrasaccharides and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Horst, Prof. Dr. Gemeindehohl 50 D-6500 Mainz 33 / DE | 02 /
Klinkhammer, Uwe, Dr. Hans Böckler Strasse 53 D-6500 Mainz 1 / DE | 03 /
Kinzy, Willy, Dr. Beethovenstrasse 31 D-6845 Gross-Rohrheim / DE | 04 /
Neumann, Siegfried, Dr. Battenbergstrasse 11 D-6104 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 05 /
Radunz, Hans-Eckart, Dr. Am Klingenteich 5 D-6109 Mühltal / DE | [1991/11] | Application number, filing date | 90116231.3 | 24.08.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | DE19893929295 | 04.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3929295 | [1991/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416396 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416396 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07H13/04, C07H15/18, // C07H3/06 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
C07H3/06 (EP);
C07H3/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07H13/04 (EP);
C07H15/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/11] | C07H15/18, C07H13/04, // C07H3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/11] | Title | German: | Tetrasaccharide und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1991/11] | English: | Tetrasaccharides and process for their preparation | [1991/11] | French: | Tetrasaccharides et procédé pour leur préparation | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 12.05.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH. vol. 145, 1986, AMSTERDAM NL pages 293 - 306; TAKEO K AND TEI S: 'Synthesis of the repeating units of schizophyllan' | [AD] - CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH. vol. 103, 1982, AMSTERDAM NL pages 53 - 64; OGAWA T AND KABURAGI T: 'Synthesis of a branched D-glucotetraose, the repeating unit of the extracellular polysaccharides of Grifola umbellate, Sclerotinia libertiana, Porodisculus pendulus, and Schizophyllum commune Fries' | [AP] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS. vol. 31, no. 22, May 1990, OXFORD GB pages 3179 - 3182; HONG N AND OGAWA T: 'Stereocontrolled syntheses of phytoalexin elicitor-active .beta.-D-gluco hexaoside and .beta.-D-glucononaoside' |