EP0421114 - Attachment of a tool for ejecting or separating parts or for a similar tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yerly, Marcel Chemin de la Bâtiaz 44 CH-1008 Jouxtens / CH | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 90116328.7 | 25.08.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | CH19890003605 | 03.10.1989 Original published format: CH 360589 | [1991/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421114 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421114 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/18 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
B26D7/1818 (EP,US);
B26D2007/1872 (EP,US);
B26D2007/189 (EP,US);
Y10T225/329 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1991/15] | Title | German: | Befestigung eines Werkzeugs zum Ausstossen oder Abtrennen von Teilen oder eines ähnlichen Werkzeugs | [1991/15] | English: | Attachment of a tool for ejecting or separating parts or for a similar tool | [1991/15] | French: | Fixation d'outil d'éjection, de séparation des poses ou outil similaire | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1149976 (FRIEDRICH SCHROETER); | [Y]US3459080 (GOETTSCH WALTER J); | [A]DE1923504 (BOBST FILS SA J); | [YD]DE2815797 |