EP0415300 - Steam and electricity production for the start of a power plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/10] | Steam and electricity production for the start and/or assistance of a power plant | ||
[1997/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häuser, Ulrich, Dr. Ketteler Strasse 11 D-6806 Viernheim / DE | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1991/10] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116332.9 | 27.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | DE19893928771 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3928771 | [1991/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0415300 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415300 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01K23/10 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
F01K23/103 (EP,US);
F01K13/02 (KR);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US);
Y02P80/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | Erzeugung von Dampf und Strom für den Anfahrbetrieb eines Dampfkraftwerkes | [1997/34] | English: | Steam and electricity production for the start of a power plant | [1997/34] | French: | Production de vapeur et d'électricité pour le démarrage d'une centrale thermique | [1997/34] |
Former [1991/10] | Erzeugung von Dampf und Strom für den Anfahr- und/oder Hilfsbetrieb eines Dampfkraftwerkes | ||
Former [1991/10] | Steam and electricity production for the start and/or assistance of a power plant | ||
Former [1991/10] | Production de vapeur et d'électricité pour le démarrage et/ou le secour d'une centrale thermique | Examination procedure | 15.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60190607 ; | [A]JP5841208 ; | [A]JP5968503 ; | [A]JP62279209 ; | [A]JP6223506 ; | [A]US3879616 (BAKER JACK M, et al); | [A]GB2084260 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]GB2166198 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 37 (M-453)(2094) 14 Februar 1986, & JP-A-60 190607 (HITACHI) 28 September 1985,, & JP60190607 A 19850928 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 124 (M-218)(1269) 28 Mai 1983, & JP-A-58 41208 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI) 10 März 1983,, & JP5841208 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 174 (M-316)(1611) 10 August 1984, & JP-A-59 68503 (HITACHI) 18 April 1984,, & JP5968503 A 19840418 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 160 (M-697)(3007) 14 Mai 1988, & JP-A-62 279209 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP.) 04 Dezember 1987,, & JP62279209 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 199 (M-602)(2646) 26 Juni 1987, & JP-A-62 23506 (TOSHIBA) 31 Januar 1987,, & JP6223506 A 00000000 |