EP0423465 - Retention means for motor vehicle door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrader, Pieter-Jan, Dipl.-Ing. Friolzheimer Strasse 76 D-7251 Flacht / DE | 02 /
Schumann, Georg Schleirmacherstrasse 9/2 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | [1991/17] | Application number, filing date | 90116343.6 | 27.08.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | DE19893934524 | 17.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3934524 | [1991/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423465 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423465 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
B60J5/0458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/17] | Title | German: | Türverkrallung an Kraftfahrzeugen | [1991/17] | English: | Retention means for motor vehicle door | [1991/17] | French: | Elément de rétention pour porte de véhicule automobile | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 24.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1347157 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]DE2028249 ; | [A]FR2225314 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) |