EP0418601 - Injection device for a diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hlousek, Jaroslaw, Dipl.-Ing. Markt 295 A-5440 Golling / AT | [1991/13] | Application number, filing date | 90116430.1 | 28.08.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | DE19893931456 | 21.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3931456 | [1991/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418601 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0418601 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02M43/04, F02M43/00 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
F02M43/00 (EP);
F02M43/04 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
F02B47/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/13] | Title | German: | Einspritzeinrichtung für Dieselmotoren | [1991/13] | English: | Injection device for a diesel engine | [1991/13] | French: | Dispositif d'injection pour moteurs diesel | [1991/13] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 13.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0282819 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2252307 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD); | [A]CH433865 (BERCHTOLD MAX PROF [CH], et al) |