EP0415361 - Pipe connection structure and vacuum-type sewage collecting apparatus incorporating the pipe connection structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ushitora, Akihiro 1-8-504, Namiki 2-chome, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Kazuo 2-3-3-203, Ikejiri Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Asanagi, Tsuneo 139-6-542, Kamisakunobe, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/10] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116498.8 | 28.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | JP19890225837 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: JP 22583789 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415361 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415361 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415361 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E03F1/00 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
E03F1/007 (EP,US);
Y10T137/402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/10] | Title | German: | Rohrverbindungsstruktur und eine Rohrverbindungsstruktur aufnehmende Vakuumabwassersammelvorrichtung | [1991/10] | English: | Pipe connection structure and vacuum-type sewage collecting apparatus incorporating the pipe connection structure | [1991/10] | French: | Structure de raccordement de tuyau et appareil à vide pour collecter des eaux d'égouts incorporant la structure de raccordement de tuyau | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 18.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.11.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 18.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3239849 (JOEL LILJENDAHL SVEN ALGOT); | [A]GB2017188 (BURTON MECH CONTRACTORS); | [A]US3730884 (BURNS B, et al); | [A]FR825010 (REALISATIONS URBAINES SOC NOUV); | [A]FR802017 (PARISIENNE D URBANISME ET DE C) |