EP0415411 - Cassette loading device for recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Toshiaki 4-14-12, Shichirigahama Higashi Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yokota, Shigeru Haitsu Tomioka 11-go, 1-45-21, Tomioka Higashi Kanazawa-ku, Yokohama / JP | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/10] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116656.1 | 30.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | JP19890226141 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: JP 22614189 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415411 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415411 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415411 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B25/06, G11B15/675 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
G11B15/67536 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/10] | G11B15/675, G11B25/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Laden einer Kassette für ein Aufnahme-/Wiedergabegerät | [1991/10] | English: | Cassette loading device for recording/reproducing apparatus | [1991/10] | French: | Dispositif de chargement de cassette pour un appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61178774 ; | [X]JP61180958 ; | [X]JP62047859 ; | [Y]JP63201941 ; | [A]JP58128066 ; | [A]JP63317971 ; | [X]EP0177133 ; | [A]EP0140211 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 2 (P-532)(2449) 06 January 1987, & JP-A-61 178774 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 11 August 1986,, & JP61178774 A 19860811 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 2 (P-532)(2449) 06 January 1987, & JP-A-61 180958 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 13 August 1986,, & JP61180958 A 19860813 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 236 (P-601)(2683) 04 August 1987, & JP-A-62 047859 (SONY CORP) 02 March 1987,, & JP62047859 A 19870302 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 492 (P-804) 22 December 1988, & JP-A-63 201941 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 22 August 1988,, & JP63201941 A 19880822 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 241 (P-232)(1386) 26 October 1983, & JP-A-58 128066 (CANON KK) 30 July 1983,, & JP58128066 A 19830730 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 159 (P-858) 18 April 1989, & JP-A-63 317971 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 26 December 1988,, & JP63317971 A 19881226 |